NJ S1117 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1096
Note: Carry Foward to future S1670
Note: Carry Foward to future S1670
Note: Carry Over of previous S948
Note: Carry Over of previous A3288
Note: Carry Foward to future S1670
Note: Carry Foward to future S1670
Note: Carry Over of previous S948
Note: Carry Over of previous A3288
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that cooperative sober living residences are inherently beneficial uses.
Title
Provides that cooperative sober living residences are inherently beneficial uses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1117 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1117 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1117 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S948 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2712 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3288 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S1117 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1117 (Carry Over) 2020-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S948 (Carry Over) 2018-01-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2712 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3288 (Carry Over) 2018-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1117 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1117_I1.HTM |