NJ A3982 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires holder of casino license to provide certain employees with certain health care and retirement benefits.
Title
Requires holder of casino license to provide certain employees with certain health care and retirement benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] |
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2573 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2573 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2573 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-14) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2573 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (46-27-1) |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2573 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3982