NJ A3972 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Substituted by S2626
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows casino and out-of-State racetrack to negotiate amount casino will pay for simulcast races.
Title
Allows casino and out-of-State racetrack to negotiate amount casino will pay for simulcast races.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Substituted by S2626 |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2626 (Same As) 2015-04-27 - Approved P.L.2015, c.33.