NJ A3906 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts mugshots of arrestees who have not been convicted of the underlying offense from State's open public records law.
Title
Exempts mugshots of arrestees who have not been convicted of the underlying offense from State's open public records law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (69-11-0) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-03-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3046 (Same As) 2013-11-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee