NJ A347 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires court to issue animal protective orders against persons found guilty of abusing animals.
Title
Requires court to issue animal protective orders against persons found guilty of abusing animals.
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Rep. Upendra Chivukula [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S891 (Same As) 2012-01-17 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee