NJ A3159 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2619
Note: Carry Foward to future S2409
Note: Carry Foward to future S2409
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that certain inmates with detainers be provided access to drug treatment programs.
Title
Requires that certain inmates with detainers be provided access to drug treatment programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-10-23 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3159 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3159 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2457 (Same As) 2014-10-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3159 (Carry Over) 2015-06-15 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2457 (Same As) 2014-10-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee