NJ A2924 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A598
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes the distribution of gross income tax refunds by making direct deposit the default distribution method.
Title
Modernizes the distribution of gross income tax refunds by making direct deposit the default distribution method.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-02 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-12-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2014-11-13 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Mazzeo) |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2924 (Carry Over) 2014-12-15 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2512 (Same As) 2014-10-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2512 (Same As) 2014-10-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee