NJ A2890 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5700
Note: Carry Over of previous S4066
Note: Carry Over of previous S4066
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits temporary appointment of additional members to the Board of Review in the Division of Employment Security.
Title
Permits temporary appointment of additional members to the Board of Review in the Division of Employment Security.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5700 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S4066 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S4066 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee