NJ A2873 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2300
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S770 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S770 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures and standards regarding public services privatization contracts.
Title
Establishes procedures and standards regarding public services privatization contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Assembly | Substituted by S770 (1R) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2873 (Carry Over) 2014-06-16 - Substituted by S770 (1R)
S770 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (24-13) (Turner)
S770 (Same As) 2014-12-18 - Lost in the Senate AVOR (24-13) (Turner)