NJ A2161 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3692
Note: Carry Over of previous S1905
Note: Carry Over of previous S1905
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public institutions of higher education to waive or reimburse application fees and transcript fees for veterans and members of military.
Title
Requires public institutions of higher education to waive or reimburse application fees and transcript fees for veterans and members of military.
Sponsors
Rep. William Moen [D] | Rep. Gerard Scharfenberger [R] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Victoria Flynn [R] |
Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3692 (Carry Over) 2023-06-22 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S1905 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2377 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
S1905 (Carry Over) 2022-06-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2377 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2161 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A2500/2161_I1.HTM |