NJ A2132 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.184.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.184.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes BPU to promulgate regulations requiring electricity providers to provide information so customers may compare prices and services.*
Title
Authorizes BPU to promulgate regulations requiring electricity providers to provide information so customers may compare prices and services.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2181 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2181 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.184. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Substituted for S2181 (1R) |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2181 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A2132 (1R)