NJ A2025 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on September 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-10 - Approved P.L.2014, c.53.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Grants immunity from liability for certain professional services rendered during emergencies under certain circumstances.
Title
Grants immunity from liability for certain professional services rendered during emergencies under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2014, c.53. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald) |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |