NH SB97 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB97
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 05/15/2024 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 05/15/2024 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of animals in product testing.
Title
Relative to the use of animals in product testing.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] |
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] | Rep. Anita Burroughs [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 05/15/2024 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 4 |
2024-05-08 | House | Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-02-29 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0371s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0371s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/08/2024; Senate Journal 3 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0371s, 02/08/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 6 |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Without Objection, Refer to Finance Rule 4-5, Motion Adopted; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2024-0010s, and 2024-0033s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2024-0033s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0010s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2024; Senate Journal 1 |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0010s, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 49 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 7 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB97 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/22/2023; Senate Journal 8