NH SB605 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1663h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/09/2024 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1663h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/09/2024 House Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to ethical standards for members of the general court.
Title
Relative to ethical standards for members of the general court.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1663h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/09/2024 House Journal 13 |
2024-05-10 | House | Amendment # 2024-1663h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/09/2024 House Journal 13 |
2024-05-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1663h 05/01/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-04-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-05 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/21/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Hearing: 03/14/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 10A |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 01/18/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |