NH SB521 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1442h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1442h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the educational credentials for master teacher.
Title
Relative to the educational credentials for master teacher.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Innis [R] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] |
Rep. Corinne Cascadden [D] | Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1442h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1442h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 |
2024-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1442h 04/09/2024 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 7 |
2024-04-05 | House | Executive Session: 04/09/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/27/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Education |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0799s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0799s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0799s, 03/07/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/15/2024; Senate Journal 4 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/15/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 7 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 1 |