NH SB284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 286; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 286; Effective 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a statewide, multi-use online energy data platform.
Title
Establishing a statewide, multi-use online energy data platform.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 218 N: 133 NV: 19 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 286; Effective 09/17/2019 |
2019-06-28 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1719h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 218-133 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 51 |
2019-05-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-1719h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 51 |
2019-05-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-05-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1719h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 12 |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/25/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 04/17/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-03-28 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 71 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1030s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment # 2019-1030s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-0855s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0855s, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |