NH HB660 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2369h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the labeling of genetically engineered foods and agricultural commodities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the labeling of genetically engineered foods and agricultural commodities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-18HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2369h
2013-11-18HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 8 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar)
2013-10-23HouseRetained Bill - Executive Session: 11/7/2013 1:00pm or immediately following House session Legislative Office Building 302
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-10-14HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/22/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-10-08HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-09-25HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/8/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303
2013-09-19HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303
2013-09-13HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-09-03HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-08-13HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-08-13HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/3/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-05-30HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 8/13/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-04-30HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-04-11HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-04-11HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-04-11HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-02-28HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-21HouseExecutive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2013-02-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/26/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-02-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-02-08HousePublic Hearing: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG.205

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback