NH HB597 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-165 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-165 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to calculating the cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and providing fiscal capacity disparity aid.
Title
Relative to calculating the cost of an opportunity for an adequate education and providing fiscal capacity disparity aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 165 NV: 18 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-165 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 26 |
2017-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0080h [^] |
2017-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18 |
2017-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 20 |