NH HB580 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB580
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a children's vision screening initiative within the state Medicaid program.
Title
Establishing a children's vision screening initiative within the state Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 59 |
2023-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 11/13/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 16 |
2023-11-08 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-2439h: 11/13/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 45 |
2023-11-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 11/13/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 44 |
2023-10-30 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 11/06/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 House Calendar 44 |
2023-10-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/18/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 40 |
2023-05-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 21 |
Same As/Similar To
HB580 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Full Committee Work Session: 05/24/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207