NH HB573 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 299
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensure of individuals as private investigators, bail enforcement agents, and security guards, requiring skills training courses for applicants for such licensure and license renewal, and relative to the certification of security officer instructors.
Title
Relative to licensure of individuals as private investigators, bail enforcement agents, and security guards, requiring skills training courses for applicants for such licensure and license renewal, and relative to the certification of security officer instructors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG. 299 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 172 |
2015-02-04 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 230 |