NH HB546 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the school building aid program.
Title
Relative to the school building aid program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 178 NV: 11 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 178 NV: 11 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - House - Table (Y: 190 N: 187 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 189 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2024-03-28 - House - OTP (Y: 182 N: 178 NV: 11 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - House - Table (Y: 190 N: 187 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-01-03 - House - ITL (Y: 186 N: 189 NV: 13 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/22/2024, Vote 6-1; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/16/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-28 | House | Reconsider Ought to Pass (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed DV 172-188 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-178 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-03-28 | House | Remove from Table (Rep. Luneau): Motion Adopted DV 182-179 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 |
2024-01-09 | House | Lay HB546 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 190-187 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 140 |
2024-01-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 186-189 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 138 |
2023-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 546-FN-LOCAL 11/16/2023 (Vote 13-12; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 36 |
2023-10-17 | House | Executive Session: 11/14/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 House Calendar 42 |
2023-08-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 09/12/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 House Calendar 36 |
2023-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-11 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Finance House Journal 3 P. 20 |
Same As/Similar To
HB546 (Carry Over) 2023-03-16 - Retained in Committee