NH HB496 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2250h for Jan 8 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2250h for Jan 8 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to driving privileges for certain first-time DWI offenders.
Title
Relative to driving privileges for certain first-time DWI offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2250h for Jan 8 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-02 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/30/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-08-19 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/11/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-05-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==Including a Presentation on the Interlock Device== |
2013-04-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/25/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-04-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/23/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 2/28/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.197 |