NH HB437 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-06 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the shortage of animal slaughter and meat processing facilities in New Hampshire and the implementation of the meat inspection program.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the shortage of animal slaughter and meat processing facilities in New Hampshire and the implementation of the meat inspection program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2021 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2021; Chapter 43; Eff: 05/17/2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted, (In recess of 05/06/2021); Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 102 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/12/2021, 02:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0404h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 20 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0404h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 20 |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0404h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 11 |
2021-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/17/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97165419816 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 48 |