NH HB437 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting proprietorships from taxation under the business enterprise tax.
Title
Exempting proprietorships from taxation under the business enterprise tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. Pamela Tucker [R] | Rep. Max Abramson [R] | Rep. William O'Brien [R] |
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 625 |
2015-03-04 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Itse); House Journal 22, PG. 559 |
2015-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 4 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 354 |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 223 |