NH HB1615 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0311; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-04 - Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0311; Effective Date 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to allocation from the annual license renewal fee for pharmacists to the impaired pharmacist program and relative to emergency prescriptions.
Title
Relative to allocation from the annual license renewal fee for pharmacists to the impaired pharmacist program and relative to emergency prescriptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-04 | House | Signed by the Governor on 8/1/2014; Chapter 0311; Effective Date 1/1/2015. |
2014-06-25 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled (6/4/14) |
2014-06-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2014-2027eba, (NT) Adopted, Voice Vote (In recess of 6/4/2014) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2027e New Title, Adopted |
2014-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Report #1963c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1963c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15 |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2014-1963c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Kotowski Replaces Rep. LeBrun |
2014-05-23 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 5/28/2014; 9:00 Amendment; Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Cataldo, and Hosmer; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2014-05-21 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Harding, Ticehurst, Williams, LeBrun |
2014-05-21 | House | Rep. Chandler moved to Non-Concur with Senate Amendment and request C of C; Motion Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 5/15/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1748s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1748s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Without Objection Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1748s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1748s, New Title, 5/15/14; Senate Calendar 18 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/15/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, on proposed non-germane amendment #2014-1322s- relative to emergency prescriptions and relative to a moratorium on the use or distribution of a certain drug to HB 1615, relative to emergency prescriptions. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 4/10/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 13 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2014-03-25 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0823h Motion Adopted Div 269-53 |
2014-03-25 | House | Amendment #2014-0823h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2014-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0823h (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-26 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/4/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/4/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205=RECESSED= |
2014-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-13 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/6/2014 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/6/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/6/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2013-12-19 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |