NH HB1589 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a veterans treatment court
Title
Establishing a veterans treatment court
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Bob Lynn [R] | Rep. Scott Wallace [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] |
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1396h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-1396h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1396h 04/02/2024 (Vote 25-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 14 |
2024-03-27 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-03-27 | House | Division Work Session: 04/01/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-03-21 | House | Division Work Session: 03/27/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/20/2024 10:35 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-03-07 | House | Division Work Session: 03/13/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0334h and 2024-0671h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | House | FLAM # 2024-0671h (Rep. Stapleton): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 |
2024-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2024-0334h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0334h 02/01/2024 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 14 |
2024-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2024 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 |