NH HB1580 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing mandatory minimum sentences.
Title
Repealing mandatory minimum sentences.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0) |
2014-10-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-09-18 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/8/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-08-28 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-03-12 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |