NH HB1577 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-21; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-21; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulating alkaline hydrolysis for the disposal of human remains.
Title
Relative to regulating alkaline hydrolysis for the disposal of human remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 209 N: 116 NV: 24 Abs: 39) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-21; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-116 |
2014-03-05 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Kappler) |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | =CONTINUED=Executive Session: 2/20/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 =RECESSED= |
2014-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/28/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration |