NH HB1570 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Sen. Bradley Moved Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Sen. Bradley Moved Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a paint stewardship program.
Title
Establishing a paint stewardship program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Burns [D] | Rep. Alisson Turcotte [D] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] | Rep. Mario Ratzki [D] |
Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 7 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 161 N: 142 NV: 28 Abs: 56) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-1053h (Y: 167 N: 135 NV: 29 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Previous Question (Y: 188 N: 112 NV: 31 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Table (Y: 136 N: 169 NV: 26 Abs: 56) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - OTPA (Y: 161 N: 142 NV: 28 Abs: 56) [FAIL]
2014-03-20 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-1053h (Y: 167 N: 135 NV: 29 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Previous Question (Y: 188 N: 112 NV: 31 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - House - Table (Y: 136 N: 169 NV: 26 Abs: 56) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1538s, Motion Failed, Regular Calendar 7Y-16N; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1538s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1538s, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/16/14, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2014-03-20 | House | Uphold Ruling of the Chair; Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 178-121 |
2014-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0618h Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 161-142 |
2014-03-20 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-1053h (Rep. Burns) Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 167-135 |
2014-03-20 | House | Previous Question (Rep. Dumaine) Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-112 |
2014-03-20 | House | Rules Suspension (Rep. Vaillancourt) |
2014-03-20 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Rideout) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 136-169 |
2014-03-20 | House | Majority Amendment #0618h Amendment Failed Voice Vote |
2014-03-20 | House | Remove from Table (Rep. Almy) Motion Adopted Div 168-130 |
2014-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Almy) Motion Adopted Div 284-13 |
2014-03-06 | House | Special Order (Rep. Sad) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study |
2014-02-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0618h (Vote 8-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/18/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/6/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/30/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-12-17 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture |