NH HB1563 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the education property tax and the authority of political subdivisions.
Title
Relative to the education property tax and the authority of political subdivisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 03/11/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-03-07 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-02-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 |