NH HB1419 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - House Signed by the Governor 07/08/2010; Effective 09/06/2010; Chapter 0281
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - House Signed by the Governor 07/08/2010; Effective 09/06/2010; Chapter 0281
Summary
Naming a bridge across the Connecticut River from Hinsdale, New Hampshire to Brattleboro, Vermont, informally known as the Hinsdale Bridge, the Anna Hunt Marsh Bridge.
Title
Naming a bridge across the Connecticut River from Hinsdale, New Hampshire to Brattleboro, Vermont, informally known as the Hinsdale Bridge, the Anna Hunt Marsh Bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | House Signed by the Governor 07/08/2010; Effective 09/06/2010; Chapter 0281 | |
2010-05-05 | House Enrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1914 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 17, Pg.411 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 16, Pg.354 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16, Pg.351 | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/28/10; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Hearing: April 22, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:40 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation & Interstate Cooperation; Senate Journal 11, Pg.263 | |
2010-03-03 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0599h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1155 | |
2010-03-03 | House Amendment #0599h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1155 | |
2010-02-16 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0599h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.888 | |
2010-02-16 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0599h (NT) for Mar 3 Consent Calendar (Vote 15-0); House Calendar 17, PG.810 | |
2010-02-10 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/16/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-02-10 | House Public Hearing on Amendment 2010-0599h: 2/16/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-02-02 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-01-13 | House Executive Session: 1/27/2010 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==RECESSED== | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 6, PG.239 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2645&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |