NH HB1413 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/27/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-29 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/27/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
Summary
Relative to the deposit of weekly rental payments by a tenant during an eviction proceeding.
Title
Relative to the deposit of weekly rental payments by a tenant during an eviction proceeding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/27/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-09-27 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-09-23 | House =CANCELLED== Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-03-18 | House Referred to Judiciary for Interim Study | |
2010-03-18 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-83; House Journal 27, PG.1435-1437 | |
2010-03-17 | House Special Order to Regular Place on Mar 18 Calendar, Without Objection; House Journal 26, PG.1391 | |
2010-02-17 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 21, PG.1192 | |
2010-02-17 | House Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Mar 17 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 21, PG.1192 | |
2010-02-04 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/7/2010 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 6, PG.239 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2620&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |