NH HB139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-22 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/19/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Status: Introduced on January 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-22 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/19/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206
Pending: House Children and Family Law Committee
Summary
Relative to the determination of parental rights and responsibilities.
Title
Relative to the determination of parental rights and responsibilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-22 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/19/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-09-15 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Children and Family Law for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-01-06 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 6, PG.273 | |
2009-11-02 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 Regular Calendar (vote 18-0); House Calendar 2, PG.88 | |
2009-09-17 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/28/2009 Legislative Office Building 206 11:00 Amendment or Immediately Following Session | |
2009-09-16 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-03-19 | House Retained in Committee | |
2009-03-04 | House Executive Session: 3/18/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-03-03 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/12/2009 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-03-03 | House ==CANCELLED== Work Session: 3/10/2009 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-02-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Work Session: 3/3/2009 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-02-10 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/17/2009 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-01-15 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2009 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 | |
2009-01-07 | House Introduced 1/7/2009 and Referred to Children and Family Law; House Journal 8, PG.123 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=517&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |