NH HB1383 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electronic copies of absentee ballot lists.
Title
Relative to electronic copies of absentee ballot lists.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law |