NH HB135 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB135
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Sen. Murphy Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Sen. Murphy Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting no-knock warrants.
Title
Prohibiting no-knock warrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 374 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 299 N: 84 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 374 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 299 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 299 N: 84 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 374 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 299 N: 84 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Sen. Murphy Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 100, State House, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0684h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 374-9 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 45 |
2023-03-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0684h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 299-84 03/22/2023 House Journal 10 P. 42 |
2023-03-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-03-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0684h 02/24/2023 (Vote 19-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 15 |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
Same As/Similar To
HB135 (Carry Over) 2023-05-11 - Sen. Murphy Moved to Rerefer to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14