NH HB1337 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 12-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 12-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authority for removal of political advertising.
Title
Relative to authority for removal of political advertising.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 12-0) |
2014-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-08-21 | House | Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2014-02-19 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 19 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Election Law |