NH HB1279 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to compliance with 2012 National Defense Authorization Act.
Title
Relative to compliance with 2012 National Defense Authorization Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Tim O'Flaherty [D] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Michael Garcia [D] | Rep. Joel Winters [D] |
Rep. Daniel Itse [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/1/14; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 4/24/14, Room 100, State House, 1:35 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0190h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #0190h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0190h for Feb 5 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |