NH HB1212 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 196-104; House Journal 21, PG.1346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-07 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 196-104; House Journal 21, PG.1346
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to resisting arrest.
Title
Relative to resisting arrest.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 196-104; House Journal 21, PG.1346 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 7 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1087 | |
2012-02-15 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2012-01-03 | House Public Hearing: 1/26/2012 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-11-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG.347 |