NH HB1204 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - House II. Remainder Effective 05/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - House II. Remainder Effective 05/23/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to matching funds of highway projects, and relative to the administration of the meals and rooms tax.
Title
Relative to matching funds of highway projects, and relative to the administration of the meals and rooms tax.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. David Campbell [D] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
Rep. Edwin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | House II. Remainder Effective 05/23/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | House I. Section 1&2 Effective 07/22/2012 | |
2012-05-25 | House Signed By Governor 05/23/2012; Chapter 0073 | |
2012-05-15 | House Enrolled; House Journal 43, PG.2345 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 14, Pg.511 | |
2012-05-09 | House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2012-1962e Adopted; House Journal 40, PG.2244 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1962e Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.2244 | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11, Pg.415 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/25/12; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Hearing: === RESCHEDULED === 4/10/12, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Hearing: === CANCELLED === 3/27/12, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 7, Pg.185 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0684h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1333-1334 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0684h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1333-1334 | |
2012-02-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0684h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.978-979 | |
2012-02-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0684h(NT) for Mar 7 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1079 | |
2012-02-14 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2012-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/16/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==Proposed Amendment #2012-0684h(NT) Immediately Following== | |
2012-02-01 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 13, PG.795 | |
2012-02-01 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 13, PG.795 | |
2012-02-01 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Chandler); House Journal 13, PG.739 | |
2012-01-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 1 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 5A, PG.1 | |
2011-12-21 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-11-16 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 7, PG.347 |