NH HB1202 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Conferee Change: Rep. S. Smith Replaces Rep. Edwards 06/04/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - Conferee Change: Rep. S. Smith Replaces Rep. Edwards 06/04/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the issuance of permits for the alteration of driveways exiting onto public ways and relative to the definition of disability or special needs under the child care scholarship program.
Title
Relative to the issuance of permits for the alteration of driveways exiting onto public ways and relative to the definition of disability or special needs under the child care scholarship program.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Alexander [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Ross Berry [R] | Rep. Joe Sweeney [R] |
Rep. Fred Plett [R] | Rep. Josh Yokela [R] | Rep. Sheila Seidel [R] | Rep. Hope Damon [D] |
Rep. Benjamin Baroody [D] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. S. Smith Replaces Rep. Edwards 06/04/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-06-04 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/04/2024 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-05-31 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Wallner Replaces Rep. Milz 05/31/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Ricciardi, Gendreau, Watters; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Ricciardi Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-29 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 21024-2192s and Requests CofC (Reps. McConkey, Milz, Cloutier, Edwards): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/29/2024 House Journal 14 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-2192s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Ricciardi Floor Amendment # 2024-2192s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to after Judiciary, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 15 |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the Committee on Finance, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Special Order to 05/23/2024, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/22/2024 Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 7-0; Senate Calendar 20A |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1845s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-1845s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1845s, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Introduced 04/11/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 10 |
2024-04-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0971h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-11 | House | Amendment # 2024-0971h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/11/2024 House Journal 11 |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0971h 04/02/2024 (Vote 23-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2024-03-28 | House | Executive Session: 04/02/2024 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-02-28 | House | Division Work Session: 03/05/2024 11:45 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred to Finance 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 15 |
2024-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0706h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 15 |
2024-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2024-0706h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 15 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0706h 02/14/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/07/2024 02:40 pm Legislative Office Building 201 |
2024-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2023-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Public Works and Highways |