NH HB1127 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 1:15 pm in Room 100, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Hearing: May 7 @ 1:15 pm in Room 100, State House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the revocation and suspension of drivers' licenses.
Title
Relative to the revocation and suspension of drivers' licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Erica Layon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 13 |
2024-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/30/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2024 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 203 House Calendar 2 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation |