NH HB1109 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Enrolled 05/30/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Enrolled 05/30/2024 House Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring student identification cards to include the helpline for the National Alliance for Eating Disorders and the 988 Suicide and Crisis Lifeline.
Title
Relative to requiring student identification cards to include the helpline for the National Alliance for Eating Disorders and the 988 Suicide and Crisis Lifeline.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Heath Howard [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] |
Rep. Hope Damon [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Valerie McDonnell [R] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | House | Enrolled 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/23/2024); Senate Journal 15 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0403h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Amendment # 2024-0403h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0403h (NT) 02/13/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6 |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/31/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education |