NH HB110 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-05 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring persons who record cruelty to livestock to report such cruelty and submit such recordings to a law enforcement agency.
Title
Requiring persons who record cruelty to livestock to report such cruelty and submit such recordings to a law enforcement agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Haefner [R] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-05 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-2209h (New Title) |
2013-11-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2209h(NT) for Jan 8 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) |
2013-08-27 | House | Retained Bill - Executive Session: 9/10/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-08-27 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-26 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/29/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/22/2013 11:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 12, PG.182 |