NE LR578 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-24 - Notice of hearing for September 26, 2014
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-24 - Notice of hearing for September 26, 2014
Pending: Legislature General Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the various Nebraska agricultural products used in the production of craft beer and distilled spirits
Title
Interim study to examine the various Nebraska agricultural products used in the production of craft beer and distilled spirits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 26, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=23633 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR578.pdf |