NE LB315 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-18 - Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Permit organization as a corporation or professional corporation by a designated broker under the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Title
Permit organization as a corporation or professional corporation by a designated broker under the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Approved by Governor on May 17, 2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Presented to Governor on May 11, 2011 | |
2011-05-11 | President/Speaker signed | |
2011-05-11 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-0-7 | |
2011-05-09 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2011-05-05 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Enrollment and Review ER118 adopted | |
2011-05-03 | Enrollment and Review ER118 filed | |
2011-05-03 | Placed on Select File with ER118 | |
2011-04-28 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2011-04-28 | Langemeier AM673 withdrawn | |
2011-04-28 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM842 adopted | |
2011-03-29 | Pahls name withdrawn | |
2011-03-16 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM842 filed | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on General File with AM842 | |
2011-03-15 | Langemeier name added | |
2011-03-08 | Notice of hearing for March 15, 2011 on AM673 | |
2011-03-07 | Langemeier AM673 filed | |
2011-01-14 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2011 | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Date of introduction |