NE LB1001 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allow growth and cultivation of industrial hemp by the Department of Agriculture or a postsecondary institution
Title
Allow growth and cultivation of industrial hemp by the Department of Agriculture or a postsecondary institution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 39-2-8 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST60 |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Wallman AM2316 adopted |
2014-03-11 | Legislature | Wallman AM2316 filed |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-04 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2022 adopted |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Judiciary AM2022 filed |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2022 |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Wallman priority bill |
2014-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Bloomfield name added |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |