ND SCR4016 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-22 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 22 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-22 - Signed by President
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the public awareness of multiple sclerosis; declaring the week of March 14-20, 2011, "MS Awareness Week"; and urging the Congress of the United States to join in the movement in creating a world free of multiple sclerosis.
Title
A concurrent resolution expressing support for the public awareness of multiple sclerosis; declaring the week of March 14-20, 2011, "MS Awareness Week"; and urging the Congress of the United States to join in the movement in creating a world free of multiple sclerosis.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Conklin [D] | Rep. Richard Holman [D] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Sen. Mac Schneider [D] | Sen. Constance Triplett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-22 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-21 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-18 | Second reading, adopted yeas 92 nays 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Hearing 02:15 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-16 | Second reading, adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 | |
2011-02-14 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |