ND SCR4009 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-07 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. DeKrey, Klein, Kretschmar A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study the adequacy of governmental services, including judicial services, to respond to issues related to an aging population, including veterans, and to study the efficacy of statutes governing public administrator services and methods for the timely and effective delivery of guardianship services.
Title
Introduced by Rep. DeKrey, Klein, Kretschmar A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Council to study the adequacy of governmental services, including judicial services, to respond to issues related to an aging population, including veterans, and to study the efficacy of statutes governing public administrator services and methods for the timely and effective delivery of guardianship services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-07 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-07 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-02 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-20 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-20 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-17 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-19 | Second reading, adopted | |
2009-02-04 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-03 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-20 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba4009.html |