ND SCR4002 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Health Services Committee) A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of community paramedics providing additional clinical and public health services, particularly in rural areas of the state.
Title
(Health Services Committee) A concurrent resolution directing the Legislative Management to study the feasibility and desirability of community paramedics providing additional clinical and public health services, particularly in rural areas of the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/02 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-03-29 | House | Second reading, adopted |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported back, do pass, placed on consent calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2013-02-18 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Second reading, adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |