ND SB2303 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 2 and 7 of section 12.1-32-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to registration requirements for sexual offenders; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Title
Registration requirements for sexual offenders; and to provide a contingent effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Rep. Karen Karls [R] |
Rep. George Keiser [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/13 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-04-10 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-10 | House | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, further amend, placed on calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Jones Roers Jones Hanson |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Conference committee appointed D. Larson Osland Nelson |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2017-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 2 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-17 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Reported back, do pass 6 0 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |